Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3477 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bolton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3477
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2009;
 May 13, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 12,
 Nays 1; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing an emergency services district to impose an
 ad valorem tax for the acquisition of land, equipment, or apparatus
 or the construction of capital improvements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 775.018(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) On the granting of a petition, the commissioners court
 shall order an election to confirm the district's creation and
 authorize the imposition of the taxes provided and [a tax] not to
 exceed the rates [rate] allowed by Section 48-e, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. Any conditions negotiated under Section 775.014(h)
 must be included on the ballot.
 SECTION 2. The heading to Section 775.074, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.074. AD VALOREM TAXES [TAX].
 SECTION 3. Section 775.074, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1),
 (a-2), and (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a) The board shall annually impose an ad valorem tax on all
 real and personal property located in the district and subject to
 district taxation for the operating and capital [district's]
 support of the district [and the purposes authorized by this
 chapter].
 (a-1)  In addition to the ad valorem tax authorized under
 Subsection (a), the board, after its establishment following an
 election held under Section 775.018 and subject to Section
 775.0745(a-1), shall annually impose an additional ad valorem tax
 on all real and personal property in the district that is subject to
 district taxation for the exclusive purposes of the acquisition of
 land, equipment, or apparatus or the construction of capital
 improvements, as described in the capital improvements plan filed
 under Subsection (a-2). The board may use the tax for any related
 purpose or pledge the revenue from the tax to pay the principal of
 and interest on any bonds or notes issued or other indebtedness,
 including loans and other financial arrangements described by
 Section 775.085, to acquire land, equipment, or apparatus or to
 construct capital improvements under this section, as the interest
 and principal come due and to provide reserve funds if prescribed in
 the resolution authorizing or the trust indenture securing the
 bonds, notes, or other indebtedness. The revenue from the tax
 authorized under this subsection shall be maintained in an account
 separate from the maintenance and operations funds of the district.
 A tax authorized by an election held under Section 775.0745(a-1)
 may not be imposed on or after the date that:
 (1)  the purchase price of the capital assets as
 provided by the capital improvements plan is paid in full; and
 (2)  the bonds, notes, or other indebtedness, including
 loans and other financial arrangements described by Section
 775.085, as authorized by the capital improvements plan, are paid
 in full.
 (a-2)  The district may impose the tax under Subsection (a-1)
 only if imposition of the tax is approved by the district voters
 voting in an election held under Section 775.0745.  At least 30 days
 before the date the board orders an election to authorize the
 additional tax described by Subsection (a-1), the district shall
 file in the administrative office of the district a capital
 improvements plan that is open to public inspection and that
 describes the planned acquisition of land, equipment, or apparatus
 or the planned construction of the capital improvements and their
 estimated cost and incidental expenses. The capital improvements
 plan is not:
 (1) part of a proposition to be voted on; or
 (2) a contract with the voters.
 (a-3)  In addition to any other information required by law,
 notice of an election to authorize the additional tax described by
 Subsection (a-1) must contain a copy of each proposition that will
 be voted on at the election. The notice must include an estimate of
 the probable cost of land, equipment, or apparatus or the
 construction of capital improvements contained in the capital
 improvements plan filed under Subsection (a-2) and any incidental
 expenses connected with the issuance of bonds, notes, or other
 indebtedness.
 SECTION 4. The heading to Section 775.0745, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.0745. ELECTION TO INCREASE TAX RATE OR IMPOSE TAX.
 SECTION 5. Section 775.0745, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  If the board decides to increase a tax imposed under
 Section 775.074(a-1) to any rate above the rate approved by the
 voters under Section 775.074(a-2), the board must order an election
 to authorize the tax rate increase. Notwithstanding Subsection
 (c), the board must hold the election on the uniform election date
 in November.  The proposition on the ballot must state the proposed
 tax rate to be authorized at the election and the notice for the
 election must conform to the requirements prescribed by Subsection
 (b) and Section 775.074(a-3).
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2009, to authorize an emergency services district
 to impose an ad valorem tax on property situated in the district not
 to exceed five cents for the acquisition of land, equipment, or
 apparatus or the construction of capital improvements, is approved
 by the voters. If the proposed amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *