E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1710
|
Journal Page: 6761
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6757
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6901
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5013
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4905
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4593
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4593
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5830
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5830
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5830
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 5830
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1500
|
Journal Page: 5756
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5756
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5206
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1721
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|