Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3479 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallego (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3479
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 23, 2009, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3479 By: Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to filing of instruments conveying real property in
 certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 11, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 11.0041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.0041.  REVIEW OF CERTAIN INSTRUMENTS IN CERTAIN
 COUNTIES. (a)  This section applies only to the county clerk of a
 county:
 (1) that:
 (A) is located on the international border; and
 (B) has a population of less than 15,000;
 (2)  in which a colonia self-help center established
 under Section 2306.582, Government Code, is located; or
 (3)  that is served by a colonia self-help center
 described by Subdivision (2) in another county.
 (b)  Before accepting an instrument conveying real property
 for filing, the county clerk may send the instrument to the county
 attorney for review under this section. Not later than one business
 day after the date the county attorney receives an instrument under
 this subsection, the county attorney shall:
 (1)  review the instrument to determine whether the
 platting requirements prescribed by Sections 232.023, 232.025, and
 232.031, Local Government Code, have been satisfied; and
 (2)  return the instrument to the county clerk with a
 statement of the county attorney's determination under Subdivision
 (1).
 (c)  Notwithstanding Section 11.004(a), the county clerk
 shall immediately notify the party that presented the instrument
 for recording that:
 (1)  the clerk is referring the instrument to the
 county attorney for review;
 (2)  the instrument will not be immediately recorded;
 and
 (3)  the clerk is not required to file an instrument the
 county attorney determines the clerk is not required to file.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an instrument delivered to a county clerk on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An instrument delivered to a county
 clerk before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *