Senate | 05/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2565 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2458 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3725 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3694 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3694 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3301 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2882 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 781 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 781 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |