E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/04/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR282
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 282
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5757
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5758
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1501
|
Journal Page: 5757
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5757
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5202
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 3271
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3243
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|