Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2450
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1118
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|