Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3494 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 12, 2009      TO: Honorable Allan Ritter, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3494 by Corte (Relating to the establishment of desired future conditions of groundwater resources and revision of those conditions by the Texas Water Development Board.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Water Code to require groundwater conservation districts to amend the desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within the management area between January 1, 2012 and November 1, 2012, and every five years thereafter.  The bill would require the Water Development Board (TWDB) to revise the desired future conditions of the groundwater resources of a groundwater conservation district if it is found that the conditions require revision, and it would make the new desired future conditions final and nonappealable.     TWDB anticipates that any costs associated with this bill could be absorbed within the agencys existing resources.   The bill would take effect September 1, 2009. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:580 Water Development Board   LBB Staff:  JOB, AH, CL    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 12, 2009





  TO: Honorable Allan Ritter, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3494 by Corte (Relating to the establishment of desired future conditions of groundwater resources and revision of those conditions by the Texas Water Development Board.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Allan Ritter, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3494 by Corte (Relating to the establishment of desired future conditions of groundwater resources and revision of those conditions by the Texas Water Development Board.), As Introduced

 Honorable Allan Ritter, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources 

 Honorable Allan Ritter, Chair, House Committee on Natural Resources 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3494 by Corte (Relating to the establishment of desired future conditions of groundwater resources and revision of those conditions by the Texas Water Development Board.), As Introduced

HB3494 by Corte (Relating to the establishment of desired future conditions of groundwater resources and revision of those conditions by the Texas Water Development Board.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Water Code to require groundwater conservation districts to amend the desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within the management area between January 1, 2012 and November 1, 2012, and every five years thereafter.  The bill would require the Water Development Board (TWDB) to revise the desired future conditions of the groundwater resources of a groundwater conservation district if it is found that the conditions require revision, and it would make the new desired future conditions final and nonappealable.     TWDB anticipates that any costs associated with this bill could be absorbed within the agencys existing resources.   The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

The bill would amend the Water Code to require groundwater conservation districts to amend the desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers within the management area between January 1, 2012 and November 1, 2012, and every five years thereafter.  The bill would require the Water Development Board (TWDB) to revise the desired future conditions of the groundwater resources of a groundwater conservation district if it is found that the conditions require revision, and it would make the new desired future conditions final and nonappealable.  

 

TWDB anticipates that any costs associated with this bill could be absorbed within the agencys existing resources.

 

The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 580 Water Development Board

580 Water Development Board

LBB Staff: JOB, AH, CL

 JOB, AH, CL