Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3494 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R5015 PMO-D
 By: Corte H.B. No. 3494


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of desired future conditions of
 groundwater resources and revision of those conditions by the Texas
 Water Development Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 36.108(d) and (m), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (d) Not later than September 1, 2010, [and every five years
 thereafter,] the districts shall consider groundwater availability
 models and other data or information for the management area and
 shall establish desired future conditions for the relevant aquifers
 within the management area. After January 1, 2012, and not later
 than November 1, 2012, and every five years thereafter, the
 districts shall as necessary revise the desired future conditions
 using current groundwater availability models and other relevant
 data or information. In establishing the desired future
 conditions of the aquifers under this section, the districts shall
 consider uses or conditions of an aquifer within the management
 area that differ substantially from one geographic area to another.
 The districts may establish different desired future conditions
 for:
 (1) each aquifer, subdivision of an aquifer, or
 geologic strata located in whole or in part within the boundaries of
 the management area; or
 (2) each geographic area overlying an aquifer in whole
 or in part or subdivision of an aquifer within the boundaries of the
 management area.
 (m) The development board shall review the petition and any
 evidence relevant to the petition. The development board shall
 hold at least one hearing at a central location in the management
 area to take testimony on the petition. The development board may
 delegate responsibility for a hearing to the executive
 administrator or to a person designated by the executive
 administrator. If the development board finds that the conditions
 require revision, the development board shall revise [submit a
 report to the districts that includes a list of findings and
 recommended revisions to] the desired future conditions of the
 groundwater resources. The development board's revision of the
 desired future conditions is final and nonappealable. The
 development board shall transmit the board's revision to the
 districts not later than 30 days after completing the revision.
 SECTION 2. Section 36.108(n), Water Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a petition filed under Section 36.108(l), Water Code, on or after
 September 1, 2009. A petition filed before September 1, 2009, is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the petition was filed,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.