Senate | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2353 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2239 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3070 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#718 | Journal Page: 3069 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3069 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3069 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3032 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3032 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 782 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |