E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4733
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1137
|
Journal Page: 4733
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4733
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2696
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1721
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#375
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hartnett
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Dunnam
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|