House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4965
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4552
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4552
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5863
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5863
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5863
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 4036
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4026
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 4026
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#620
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|