Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2554
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#507
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2360
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 786
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 786
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|