House | 05/08/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2998 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1969 | Journal Page: 2998 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/8/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2479 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2479 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Postponed | 5/5/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2223 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2223 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Postponed | 5/1/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1993 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1993 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Postponed | 4/28/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1803 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 818 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 786 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 786 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |