Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4196
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3059
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3058
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|