E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4352
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|