House | 05/13/2009 | Postponed | 6/2/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3346 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Postponed | 5/13/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3296 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3296 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 302 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 302 | |
House | 12/02/2008 | Filed |