House | 05/05/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |