Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2715 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#351 | Journal Page: 1963 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1900 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |