E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/31/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5976 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6039 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5132 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3513 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3513 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3513 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3513 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3513 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3513 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3513 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2496 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2496 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2399 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#857 | Journal Page: 3514 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3514 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3514 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3430 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3430 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2216 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |