E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/31/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5976 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6039 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5120 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3181 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3181 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3181 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3181 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3181 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3181 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3181 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1881 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#412 | Journal Page: 2171 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2153 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2153 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1929 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |