House
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 791
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|