E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5197
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5132
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#348
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 791
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 791
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|