House | 05/11/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3164 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2298 | Journal Page: 3161 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 793 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 793 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |