House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 6/30/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2605 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2539 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Amended | 1-Solomons | Journal Page: 2538 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 12/03/2008 | Filed |