Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3653 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Marquez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 3653
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of restraints to control the movement of
 pregnant women and female children confined in certain correctional
 facilities in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 501.066 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.066.  RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT INMATE OR DEFENDANT.
 (a) The department may not use restraints to control the movement
 of a pregnant woman in the custody of the department at any time
 during which the woman is in labor or delivery or recovering from
 delivery, unless the director or director's designee determines
 that the use of restraints is necessary to:
 (1)  ensure the safety and security of the woman or her
 infant, department or medical personnel, or any member of the
 public; or
 (2)  prevent a substantial risk that the woman will
 attempt escape.
 (b)  If a determination to use restraints is made under
 Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which
 the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under
 the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent
 escape.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 61, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 61.07611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.07611.  RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT JUVENILE. (a) The
 commission may not use restraints to control the movement of a
 pregnant child who is committed to the commission at any time during
 which the child is in labor or delivery or recovering from delivery,
 unless the executive director or executive director's designee
 determines that the use of restraints is necessary to:
 (1)  ensure the safety and security of the child or her
 infant, commission or medical personnel, or any member of the
 public; or
 (2)  prevent a substantial risk that the child will
 attempt escape.
 (b)  If a determination to use restraints is made under
 Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which
 the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under
 the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent
 escape.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter F, Chapter 361, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.082.  RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT INMATE OR DEFENDANT.
 (a) A municipal or county jail may not use restraints to control
 the movement of a pregnant woman in the custody of the jail at any
 time during which the woman is in labor or delivery or recovering
 from delivery, unless the sheriff or another person with
 supervisory authority over the jail determines that the use of
 restraints is necessary to:
 (1)  ensure the safety and security of the woman or her
 infant, jail or medical personnel, or any member of the public; or
 (2)  prevent a substantial risk that the woman will
 attempt escape.
 (b)  If a determination to use restraints is made under
 Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which
 the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under
 the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent
 escape.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *