1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 3653 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the use of restraints to control the movement of |
---|
6 | 6 | | pregnant women and female children confined in certain correctional |
---|
7 | 7 | | facilities in this state. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 501, Government Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 501.066 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 501.066. RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT INMATE OR DEFENDANT. |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a) The department may not use restraints to control the movement |
---|
13 | 13 | | of a pregnant woman in the custody of the department at any time |
---|
14 | 14 | | during which the woman is in labor or delivery or recovering from |
---|
15 | 15 | | delivery, unless the director or director's designee determines |
---|
16 | 16 | | that the use of restraints is necessary to: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) ensure the safety and security of the woman or her |
---|
18 | 18 | | infant, department or medical personnel, or any member of the |
---|
19 | 19 | | public; or |
---|
20 | 20 | | (2) prevent a substantial risk that the woman will |
---|
21 | 21 | | attempt escape. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) If a determination to use restraints is made under |
---|
23 | 23 | | Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which |
---|
24 | 24 | | the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under |
---|
25 | 25 | | the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent |
---|
26 | 26 | | escape. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 61, Human Resources Code, |
---|
28 | 28 | | is amended by adding Section 61.07611 to read as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | Sec. 61.07611. RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT JUVENILE. (a) The |
---|
30 | 30 | | commission may not use restraints to control the movement of a |
---|
31 | 31 | | pregnant child who is committed to the commission at any time during |
---|
32 | 32 | | which the child is in labor or delivery or recovering from delivery, |
---|
33 | 33 | | unless the executive director or executive director's designee |
---|
34 | 34 | | determines that the use of restraints is necessary to: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) ensure the safety and security of the child or her |
---|
36 | 36 | | infant, commission or medical personnel, or any member of the |
---|
37 | 37 | | public; or |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) prevent a substantial risk that the child will |
---|
39 | 39 | | attempt escape. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) If a determination to use restraints is made under |
---|
41 | 41 | | Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which |
---|
42 | 42 | | the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under |
---|
43 | 43 | | the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent |
---|
44 | 44 | | escape. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter F, Chapter 361, Local Government |
---|
46 | 46 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 361.082 to read as follows: |
---|
47 | 47 | | Sec. 361.082. RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT INMATE OR DEFENDANT. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (a) A municipal or county jail may not use restraints to control |
---|
49 | 49 | | the movement of a pregnant woman in the custody of the jail at any |
---|
50 | 50 | | time during which the woman is in labor or delivery or recovering |
---|
51 | 51 | | from delivery, unless the sheriff or another person with |
---|
52 | 52 | | supervisory authority over the jail determines that the use of |
---|
53 | 53 | | restraints is necessary to: |
---|
54 | 54 | | (1) ensure the safety and security of the woman or her |
---|
55 | 55 | | infant, jail or medical personnel, or any member of the public; or |
---|
56 | 56 | | (2) prevent a substantial risk that the woman will |
---|
57 | 57 | | attempt escape. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (b) If a determination to use restraints is made under |
---|
59 | 59 | | Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which |
---|
60 | 60 | | the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under |
---|
61 | 61 | | the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent |
---|
62 | 62 | | escape. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
64 | 64 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
65 | 65 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
66 | 66 | | I certify that H.B. No. 3653 was passed by the House on May |
---|
67 | 67 | | 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 116, Nays 30, 2 present, not |
---|
68 | 68 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
69 | 69 | | H.B. No. 3653 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
70 | 70 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
71 | 71 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
72 | 72 | | on H.B. No. 3653 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, |
---|
73 | 73 | | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
74 | 74 | | ______________________________ |
---|
75 | 75 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
76 | 76 | | I certify that H.B. No. 3653 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
77 | 77 | | amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
78 | 78 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
79 | 79 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
80 | 80 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
81 | 81 | | 3653 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
82 | 82 | | ______________________________ |
---|
83 | 83 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
84 | 84 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | Date |
---|
86 | 86 | | __________________ |
---|
87 | 87 | | Governor |
---|