Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3653 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3653


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of restraints to control the movement of
 pregnant women and female children confined in certain correctional
 facilities in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 501, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 501.066 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.066.  RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT INMATE OR DEFENDANT.
 (a)  The department may not use restraints to control the movement
 of a pregnant woman in the custody of the department at any time
 during which the woman is in labor or delivery or recovering from
 delivery, unless the director or director's designee determines
 that the use of restraints is necessary to:
 (1)  ensure the safety and security of the woman or her
 infant, department or medical personnel, or any member of the
 public; or
 (2)  prevent a substantial risk that the woman will
 attempt escape.
 (b)  If a determination to use restraints is made under
 Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which
 the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under
 the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent
 escape.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 61, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 61.07611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.07611.  RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT JUVENILE.  (a)  The
 commission may not use restraints to control the movement of a
 pregnant child who is committed to the commission at any time during
 which the child is in labor or delivery or recovering from delivery,
 unless the executive director or executive director's designee
 determines that the use of restraints is necessary to:
 (1)  ensure the safety and security of the child or her
 infant, commission or medical personnel, or any member of the
 public; or
 (2)  prevent a substantial risk that the child will
 attempt escape.
 (b)  If a determination to use restraints is made under
 Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which
 the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under
 the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent
 escape.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter F, Chapter 361, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.082.  RESTRAINT OF PREGNANT INMATE OR DEFENDANT.
 (a)  A municipal or county jail may not use restraints to control
 the movement of a pregnant woman in the custody of the jail at any
 time during which the woman is in labor or delivery or recovering
 from delivery, unless the sheriff or another person with
 supervisory authority over the jail determines that the use of
 restraints is necessary to:
 (1)  ensure the safety and security of the woman or her
 infant, jail or medical personnel, or any member of the public; or
 (2)  prevent a substantial risk that the woman will
 attempt escape.
 (b)  If a determination to use restraints is made under
 Subsection (a), the type of restraint used and the manner in which
 the restraint is used must be the least restrictive available under
 the circumstances to ensure safety and security or to prevent
 escape.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3653 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 116, Nays 30, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3653 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3653 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3653 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3653 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor