Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3655 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R11561 JD-F
22 By: Bohac H.B. No. 3655
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to an adjustment to the taxable value of property in a
88 school district in the comptroller's annual property value study as
99 a result of a determination by an appraisal review board of a
1010 taxpayer protest on the ground of unequal appraisal.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 403.302(d), Government Code, is amended
1313 to read as follows:
1414 (d) For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
1515 the market value of all taxable property less:
1616 (1) the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
1717 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b) or (c), Tax
1818 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
1919 district;
2020 (2) one-half of the total dollar amount of any
2121 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
2222 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
2323 district;
2424 (3) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
2525 before May 31, 1993, within a reinvestment zone under agreements
2626 authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code;
2727 (4) subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
2828 of any captured appraised value of property that:
2929 (A) is within a reinvestment zone created on or
3030 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
3131 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
3232 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
3333 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
3434 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
3535 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
3636 provided by Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31, 1999, and
3737 within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries existed on
3838 September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to the
3939 property regardless of when made;
4040 (B) generates taxes paid into a tax increment
4141 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
4242 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
4343 before September 1, 1999; and
4444 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
4545 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
4646 (5) for a school district for which a deduction from
4747 taxable value is made under Subdivision (4), an amount equal to the
4848 taxable value required to generate revenue when taxed at the school
4949 district's current tax rate in an amount that, when added to the
5050 taxes of the district paid into a tax increment fund as described by
5151 Subdivision (4)(B), is equal to the total amount of taxes the
5252 district would have paid into the tax increment fund if the district
5353 levied taxes at the rate the district levied in 2005;
5454 (6) the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
5555 value of property that:
5656 (A) is within a reinvestment zone:
5757 (i) created on or before December 31, 2008,
5858 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
5959 (ii) the project plan for which includes
6060 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
6161 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
6262 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
6363 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
6464 or for affordable housing;
6565 (B) generates school district taxes that are paid
6666 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
6767 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
6868 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
6969 (7) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
7070 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
7171 (8) the difference between the comptroller's estimate
7272 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
7373 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
7474 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
7575 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
7676 (9) the portion of the appraised value of residence
7777 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
7878 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
7979 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
8080 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
8181 required by law;
8282 (10) a portion of the market value of property not
8383 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of:
8484 (A) action required by statute or the
8585 constitution of this state that, if the tax rate adopted by the
8686 district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the
8787 difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on
8888 the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and
8989 the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the
9090 property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that
9191 portion to be deducted; or
9292 (B) action taken by the district under Subchapter
9393 B or C, Chapter 313, Tax Code;
9494 (11) the market value of all tangible personal
9595 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
9696 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
9797 (12) the appraised value of property the collection of
9898 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
9999 Code;
100100 (13) the portion of the appraised value of property
101101 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
102102 Section 33.065, Tax Code; [and]
103103 (14) the amount by which the market value of a
104104 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
105105 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
106106 that section; and
107107 (15) the total dollar amount of any adjustments
108108 resulting from protests on the ground of unequal appraisal
109109 determined under Section 41.43, Tax Code.
110110 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
111111 to the annual study conducted under Section 403.302, Government
112112 Code, as amended by this Act, to determine taxable value for a tax
113113 year that begins on or after January 1, 2009. The annual study to
114114 determine taxable value for a tax year that begins before that date
115115 is covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective
116116 date of this Act, and the prior law is continued in effect for that
117117 purpose.
118118 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
119119 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
120120 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
121121 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
122122 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.