Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2353
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#697
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3002
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hopson
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/8/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2616
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2616
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/6/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2524
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2524
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 796
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 796
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|