E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6584
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1681
|
Journal Page: 6585
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6571
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6900
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4846
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4553
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4553
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3966
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3965
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
10:35 PM
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 3478
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3477
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3477
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3477
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3477
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Tagged
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#882
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3564
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
6-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 3562
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
5-McCall
|
Journal Page: 3561
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Referred to subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 796
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 796
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|