Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3186
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2137
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2592
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#598
|
Journal Page: 2591
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2591
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 2591
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2526
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 2525
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2525
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 823
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 823
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|