House | 04/07/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1117 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 297 | Journal Page: 1115 |
House | 04/07/2009 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Postponed | 4/7/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1076 |
House | 04/06/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1076 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Postponed | 4/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 900 |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 860 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 271 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 271 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |