Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB383 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Heflin (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 383
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2009, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 383 By: Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county bail bond board meetings in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1704.055, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), a [A] board shall
 meet:
 (1) at least once a month; and
 (2) at other times at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (c)  A board in a county with a population of less than 50,000
 shall meet at least four times each year during the months of
 January, April, July, and October at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *