Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3834 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hilderbran (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 3834
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2009;
 May 19, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the seller of certain real property to
 provide notice regarding the purchaser's duty to register water
 wells located or drilled on the property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 5, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 5.0141 to read as follows:
 Sec. 5.0141.  NOTICE OF OBLIGATION TO REGISTER WATER WELLS.
 (a)  In this section, "district" means a groundwater conservation
 district to which Chapter 36, Water Code, is applicable, a
 subsidence district governed by Chapter 8801, Special District
 Local Laws Code, or a subsidence district established under Chapter
 1045, Acts of the 71st Legislature, Regular Session, 1989.
 (b)  A seller of real property larger than one acre any part
 of which is located in a district shall give to the purchaser of the
 property a written notice that reads substantially similar to the
 following:
 NOTICE OF OBLIGATION TO REGISTER WATER WELLS WITH THE (name of
 district)
 As a purchaser of this parcel of real property you are
 obligated to register all existing water wells located on the
 property and all water wells drilled on the property after the
 purchase of this parcel with the (name of district) as provided by
 (Chapter 36, Water Code, Chapter 8801, Special District Local Laws
 Code, or Chapter 1045, Acts of the 71st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 1989, as applicable).
 Your failure to register water wells located or drilled on
 the property with the (name of district) may be a violation of the
 district's rules or illegal drainage and may result in an action for
 damages.
 Date: ____________________ _____________________________ Date: ____________________ _____________________________
Date: ____________________ _____________________________
 Signature of Purchaser  Signature of Purchaser
 Signature of Purchaser
 (c)  The seller shall deliver the notice required by
 Subsection (b) to the purchaser before the effective date of an
 executory contract binding the purchaser to purchase the property.
 The notice may be given separately, as part of the contract during
 negotiations, or as part of any other notice the seller delivers to
 the purchaser.  If the notice is included as part of the executory
 contract or another notice, the title of the notice prescribed by
 Subsection (b) and the purchaser's signature on the notice may be
 omitted.
 (d) This section does not apply to a transfer:
 (1)  to a mortgagee by a mortgagor or successor in
 interest or to a beneficiary of a deed of trust by a trustor or
 successor in interest;
 (2)  by a mortgagee or a beneficiary under a deed of
 trust who has acquired the land at a sale conducted under a power of
 sale under a deed of trust or a sale under a court-ordered
 foreclosure or has acquired the land by a deed in lieu of
 foreclosure;
 (3)  by a fiduciary in the course of the administration
 of a decedent's estate, guardianship, conservatorship, or trust;
 (4)  from one co-owner to another co-owner of an
 undivided interest in the real property;
 (5)  to a spouse or a person in the lineal line of
 consanguinity of the seller; or
 (6)  of only a mineral interest, leasehold interest, or
 security interest.
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to a transfer of property that occurs on or after the effective
 date of this Act. For purposes of this section, a transfer of
 property occurs before the effective date of this Act if the
 executory contract binding the purchaser to purchase the property
 is executed before that date.
 (b) A transfer of property before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *

Date: ____________________ _____________________________

 Signature of Purchaser