Senate | 05/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2756 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2011 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | RV#521 | Journal Page: 2373 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2373 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2373 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2326 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2326 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 827 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 827 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |