Senate | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2137 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2137 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2057 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2674 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#544 | Journal Page: 2461 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2446 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2216 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |