House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1929 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1232 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 830 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |