House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4598
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4598
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5935
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5935
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5935
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3623
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Zaffirini
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3617
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#757
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Menendez
|
Journal Page: 3151
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3151
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|