House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 833 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 833 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |