1 | 1 | | 81R5230 JTS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Truitt H.B. No. 3942 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to a pilot test of an advanced control technology for the |
---|
8 | 8 | | reduction of nitrogen oxides emissions. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REDUCTION TECHNOLOGY PILOT. |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall select one |
---|
12 | 12 | | dry process cement kiln stack in a nonattainment or a near |
---|
13 | 13 | | nonattainment area for the purpose of a pilot test to determine the |
---|
14 | 14 | | effectiveness of a selective catalytic reduction technology as an |
---|
15 | 15 | | advanced control technology for reducing the nitrogen oxides |
---|
16 | 16 | | emissions from the cement kiln stack. The Texas Commission on |
---|
17 | 17 | | Environmental Quality shall select a selective catalytic reduction |
---|
18 | 18 | | technology vendor to provide the selective catalytic reduction |
---|
19 | 19 | | technology needed to conduct the testing required by this |
---|
20 | 20 | | subsection. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) design, supervise, and monitor the testing |
---|
23 | 23 | | required by Subsection (a) of this section in consultation with: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (A) the selective catalytic reduction technology |
---|
25 | 25 | | vendor selected by the commission; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (B) the owner or operator of the cement kiln |
---|
27 | 27 | | stack selected for testing under Subsection (a) of this section; |
---|
28 | 28 | | and |
---|
29 | 29 | | (C) representatives of a regional council of |
---|
30 | 30 | | government of the region in which the cement kiln is located; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (2) verify the accuracy of the results of the testing. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality may |
---|
33 | 33 | | accept and hold a gift or grant conditioned on its use for testing |
---|
34 | 34 | | advanced controls for nitrogen oxides emissions from cement kilns |
---|
35 | 35 | | in a nonattainment or near nonattainment area and use such gifts or |
---|
36 | 36 | | grants without an appropriation for the pilot test under this |
---|
37 | 37 | | section. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (d) If this Act takes effect before July 31, 2009, the Texas |
---|
39 | 39 | | Commission on Environmental Quality shall: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) not later than July 31, 2009, select a dry process |
---|
41 | 41 | | cement kiln stack for testing as required under Subsection (a) of |
---|
42 | 42 | | this section; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (2) not later than August 31, 2009, select a selective |
---|
44 | 44 | | catalytic reduction technology vendor as required under Subsection |
---|
45 | 45 | | (a) of this section; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (3) not later than November 30, 2009, begin testing |
---|
47 | 47 | | the selective catalytic reduction technology. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (e) If this Act takes effect on or after July 31, 2009, the |
---|
49 | 49 | | Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) not later than September 30, 2009, select a dry |
---|
51 | 51 | | process cement kiln stack for testing as required under Subsection |
---|
52 | 52 | | (a) of this section; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) not later than October 31, 2009, select a |
---|
54 | 54 | | selective catalytic reduction technology vendor as required under |
---|
55 | 55 | | Subsection (a) of this section; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | (3) not later than January 1, 2009, begin testing the |
---|
57 | 57 | | selective catalytic reduction technology. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (f) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (1) not later than December 31, 2010, complete the |
---|
60 | 60 | | selective catalytic reduction technology testing required under |
---|
61 | 61 | | Subsection (a) of this section; and |
---|
62 | 62 | | (2) not later than January 1, 2011, prepare and |
---|
63 | 63 | | deliver to each member of the legislature a report describing: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (A) the results of the testing, including whether |
---|
65 | 65 | | any reduction in nitrogen oxides emissions resulted from the use of |
---|
66 | 66 | | the selective catalytic reduction technology; and |
---|
67 | 67 | | (B) the costs involved in the installation, use, |
---|
68 | 68 | | and maintenance of the selective catalytic reduction technology. |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 2. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
70 | 70 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
71 | 71 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
72 | 72 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
73 | 73 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|