House | 04/30/2009 | Postponed | 7/4/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2202 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2201 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Postponed | 4/30/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1888 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1888 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Postponed | 4/27/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1795 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1794 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Postponed | 4/24/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1751 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 836 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 836 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |