Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2145 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2697 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#626 | Journal Page: 2697 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2697 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Amended | 1-Gonzalez Toureilles | Journal Page: 2696 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2696 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2610 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2610 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2329 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2329 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 837 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 837 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |