House | 05/04/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2414 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2043 | Journal Page: 2414 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Postponed | 5/4/09 1:00 PM | Journal Page: 2323 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 838 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 838 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |