Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB401 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 401
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to
 change the date of their general elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 41.0052, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The governing body of a political subdivision, other
 than a county, that holds its general election for officers on a
 date other than the November uniform election date may, not later
 than December 31, 2010, change the date on which it holds its
 general election for officers to the November uniform election
 date.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *