House | 05/05/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2495 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2163 | Journal Page: 2495 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 840 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 840 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |