E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5936
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1536
|
Journal Page: 5936
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5936
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
CA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 3611
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3611
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3611
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#364
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hamilton
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/27/09 3:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|