1 | 1 | | 81R903 KJM-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Castro H.B. No. 4047 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the residency requirements for tuition and fee |
---|
8 | 8 | | exemptions for certain military personnel and their dependents. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 54.203, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
11 | 11 | | amending Subsections (a), (b), (b-1), and (d) and adding Subsection |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (a) The governing board of each institution of higher |
---|
14 | 14 | | education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of |
---|
15 | 15 | | all dues, fees, and charges, including fees for correspondence |
---|
16 | 16 | | courses but excluding general deposit fees, student services fees, |
---|
17 | 17 | | and any fees or charges for lodging, board, or clothing, provided |
---|
18 | 18 | | the person [persons] seeking the exemption declared this state as |
---|
19 | 19 | | the person's home of record in the manner provided by the applicable |
---|
20 | 20 | | military or other service [exemptions were citizens of Texas] at |
---|
21 | 21 | | the time the person [they] entered the service [services indicated] |
---|
22 | 22 | | and is a resident of this state under Subchapter B [have resided in |
---|
23 | 23 | | Texas for at least the period of 12 months before the date of |
---|
24 | 24 | | registration]: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) all nurses and honorably discharged members of the |
---|
26 | 26 | | armed forces of the United States who served during the |
---|
27 | 27 | | Spanish-American War or during World War I; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary |
---|
29 | 29 | | Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency |
---|
30 | 30 | | Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces |
---|
31 | 31 | | of the United States who served during World War II except those who |
---|
32 | 32 | | were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or |
---|
33 | 33 | | because of a personal request on the part of the person that the |
---|
34 | 34 | | person [he] be discharged from service; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (3) all honorably discharged men and women of the |
---|
36 | 36 | | armed forces of the United States who served during the national |
---|
37 | 37 | | emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as |
---|
38 | 38 | | the Korean War; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (4) all persons who were honorably discharged from the |
---|
40 | 40 | | armed forces of the United States after serving on active military |
---|
41 | 41 | | duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a |
---|
42 | 42 | | portion of their active duty during: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (A) the Cold War which began on the date of the |
---|
44 | 44 | | termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3) [of |
---|
45 | 45 | | this subsection]; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (B) the Vietnam era which began on December 21, |
---|
47 | 47 | | 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (C) the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on |
---|
49 | 49 | | August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (D) the Panama era which began on December 20, |
---|
51 | 51 | | 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (E) the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2, |
---|
53 | 53 | | 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential |
---|
54 | 54 | | proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (F) the national emergency by reason of certain |
---|
56 | 56 | | terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or |
---|
57 | 57 | | (G) any future national emergency declared in |
---|
58 | 58 | | accordance with federal law. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (a-1) A person who received an exemption provided by |
---|
60 | 60 | | Subsection (a) in the 2008-2009 academic year continues to be |
---|
61 | 61 | | eligible for the exemption provided by that subsection as long as |
---|
62 | 62 | | the person is continuously enrolled in an institution of higher |
---|
63 | 63 | | education, subject to the other provisions of this section other |
---|
64 | 64 | | than the requirement of Subsection (a) that the person must have |
---|
65 | 65 | | declared this state as the person's home of record at the time of |
---|
66 | 66 | | entering the service. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (b) The exemptions provided for in Subsection (a) [of this |
---|
68 | 68 | | section] also apply [and inure] to [the benefit of]: |
---|
69 | 69 | | (1) the children of members of the armed forces of the |
---|
70 | 70 | | United States: |
---|
71 | 71 | | (A) who are or were killed in action; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (B) who die or died while in service; |
---|
73 | 73 | | (C) who are missing in action; |
---|
74 | 74 | | (D) whose death is documented to be directly |
---|
75 | 75 | | caused by illness or injury connected with service in the armed |
---|
76 | 76 | | forces of the United States; or |
---|
77 | 77 | | (E) who became totally disabled for purposes of |
---|
78 | 78 | | employability according to the disability ratings of the Department |
---|
79 | 79 | | of Veterans Affairs as a result of a service-related injury; and |
---|
80 | 80 | | (2) the [orphans or] children of members of the Texas |
---|
81 | 81 | | National Guard and the Texas Air National Guard who: |
---|
82 | 82 | | (A) were killed since January 1, 1946, while on |
---|
83 | 83 | | active duty either in the service of their state or the United |
---|
84 | 84 | | States; or |
---|
85 | 85 | | (B) are totally disabled for purposes of |
---|
86 | 86 | | employability according to the disability ratings of the Department |
---|
87 | 87 | | of Veterans Affairs, regardless of whether the members are eligible |
---|
88 | 88 | | to receive disability benefits from the department, as a result of a |
---|
89 | 89 | | service-related injury suffered since January 1, 1946, while on |
---|
90 | 90 | | active duty either in the service of this state or the United |
---|
91 | 91 | | States. |
---|
92 | 92 | | (b-1) To qualify for an exemption under Subsection (b), a |
---|
93 | 93 | | person must [be a citizen of Texas and must] have resided in this |
---|
94 | 94 | | [the] state for at least 12 months immediately preceding the date of |
---|
95 | 95 | | the person's registration. |
---|
96 | 96 | | (d) The governing board of each institution of higher |
---|
97 | 97 | | education granting an exemption under this section [exemptions] |
---|
98 | 98 | | shall require every applicant claiming the [benefit of an] |
---|
99 | 99 | | exemption to submit satisfactory evidence that the applicant |
---|
100 | 100 | | qualifies for [he fulfills] the exemption [necessary citizenship |
---|
101 | 101 | | and residency requirements]. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies |
---|
103 | 103 | | beginning with tuition and fees for the 2009 fall semester. Tuition |
---|
104 | 104 | | and fees for a term or semester before the 2009 fall semester are |
---|
105 | 105 | | covered by the law in effect immediately before the effective date |
---|
106 | 106 | | of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that |
---|
107 | 107 | | purpose. |
---|
108 | 108 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
109 | 109 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
110 | 110 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
111 | 111 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
112 | 112 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|