E
|
05/29/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2492
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3947
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#317
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1853
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1813
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 315
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 315
|
House
|
12/15/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|