Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2561 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 2561 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2496 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2496 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3332 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#801 | Journal Page: 3331 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3331 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amended | 3-B. Brown | Journal Page: 3328 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3328 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3287 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3287 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Amended | 4-T. King | Journal Page: 3285 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3283 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Postponed | 5/12/09 9:00 PM | Journal Page: 3276 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3276 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 843 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 843 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |