Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5214
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3032
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2730
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3196
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 844
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 844
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|